judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUSAN LITTLEFIELD HAINES v. OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Heading (06-147)
Case Number:06-147Case Docketed On:06/26/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:SUSAN LITTLEFIELD HAINES v. OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Full Title:SUSAN LITTLEFIELD HAINES, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSusan Littlefield HainesGibson Sean Benham
AppelleeOld Republic National Title Insurance CompanyKeith Robert Nachbar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Easements, Insurance Law, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 31
Citation:178 P.3d 1086

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/26/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/26/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/26/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/14/2006Brief - Appellant and received copy of desigantion of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
08/14/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntary for failure to ensure completeness of recordMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/14/2006Memorandum - In support of motion to dismiss appeal for failure to ensure completeness of recordMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
08/31/2006Response/Objection - Motion to dismiss appeal for failure to ensure completeness of recordResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/06/2006Order - Denying motion to dismiss appealOrderDenyFinal
09/27/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
10/16/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/16/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/23/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/06/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/29/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
11/30/2006Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Gibson Sean Benham for appellant; Keith R. Nachbar for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/20/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/07/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/09/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal