judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

GULF, COLORADO AND SANTA FE RAILWAY COMPANY, ET AL., MOTOR CARRIER PETITIONERS, YORK TRANSPORT COMPANY, ET AL. v. RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.

Case: A-6993
A-6993
08/15/1958
Application for Writ of Error
GULF, COLORADO AND SANTA FE RAILWAY COMPANY, ET AL., MOTOR CARRIER PETITIONERS, YORK TRANSPORT COMPANY, ET AL.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/11/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/10/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/15/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/23/1958Response to Motion filed
12/11/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/10/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/08/1958Motion to dismiss
08/25/1958Additional Copies received
08/15/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/15/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Motor Carrier PetitionersPetitioner
York Transport Company, et al.Petitioner
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Respondent
Gulf, Colorado and Santa Fe Railway Company, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information