judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT A. REED V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0731
Short Caption:ROBERT A. REED V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bribery
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-15815-09Filed Date:06/07/2010

Opening Event Date:06/07/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/22/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/12/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/15/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert A. Reed Y
Thomas T. HeslepYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Elizabeth GabrielYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/24/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Thomas Heslep, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to June 7, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, , appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/30/2010 On consideration of this court's order of June 24, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (JAC)
08/20/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
08/20/2010RECEIVED- aplt's statement regarding transcript
08/24/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
08/24/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
09/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (463 pgs/Maddox) 2/22-23/10 proc.
09/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (464-979 pgs/Maddox) 2/24-25/10 proc.
09/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (980-1148 pgs/Maddox) 2/26/10 proc.
09/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (296 pgs/Hunt) 3/1-2/10 proc.
09/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (40 pgs/Hunt) 3/3-5/10 proc.
09/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (12 pgs/Maar) 4/29/10 proc. CD attached
09/22/2010RECORD COPIES
09/22/2010RECORD INDEX
09/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (Sealed pleadings)
09/22/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/28/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/17/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 28, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
12/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 1, 2011. (JAC)
03/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/1/11. no oppo
03/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 1, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/31/2011APPENDIX
05/04/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/04/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/06/2011CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
05/13/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (28 pgs/Richer) 11/13/09 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (10 pgs/McCarn) 11/25/09 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (19 pgs/tape) 1/14/10 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (5 pgs/tape) 1/19/10 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (14 pgs/tape) 2/4/10 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (19 pgs/Rogers) 2/16/10 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (120 pgs/Salazar) 2/17/10 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (69 pgs/McCarn) 5/21/10 proc. w/cd
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/07/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appellant referring a pro se letter received from appellant.
10/12/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Ruiz, Nebeker
11/23/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
12/15/2011FiledMandate