judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. MCGEE (ANDRE)

Case Information: 34694
Short Caption:STATE VS. MCGEE (ANDRE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35576
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C125996Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07740
08/19/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 3, 1999. To Court Reporter: Lori Judd. 99-07744
08/19/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 22, 1999 and July 8, 1999. To Court Reporter: James Helloso. 99-07746
08/31/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/22/99, 7/8/99. Court Reporter: James A. Helleso. 99-08166
10/07/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time. 99-09660
10/11/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Opposition to Motion to Enlarge Time/Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 99-09809
10/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. On October 7, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion for a 60 day extension to file the fast track statement. The motion for an extension is denied. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 15 days of this court. Failure to comply with the provisions of NRAP 3C may result in sanctions. 99-10470
11/12/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 16 Page Fast Track Statement. 99-11134
11/12/1999Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 99-11135
11/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. On November 12, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages. The motion is granted. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement provisionally submitted on November 12, 1999. 99-11577
11/19/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11135
11/19/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-11137
11/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The motion to dismiss is denied. Briefing in this appeal shall proceed according to this court's order of October 25,1999, and the deadlines set forth in NRAP 3C. 99-11642
11/30/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss State's Appeal. 99-11921
11/30/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11922
12/07/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss State's [Appellant's] Appeal. 99-12244
12/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. On November 30, 1999, counsel for respondent filed a second motion to dismiss this appeal. The motion to dismiss is denied. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 99-12882
02/01/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-01615
02/01/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate. (Nos. 34694 and 35576). 00-01616
02/14/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 2/11/00. 00-02329
02/14/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Consolidate/Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Certiorari in Supreme Court Case Number 35576 (nos. 34694/35576). 00-02330
03/16/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-04156
03/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. " . . . we deny this petition for writ of certiorari in Docket No. 35576." We further deny the State's motion, of February 1, 2000, to consolidate this matter with the appeal pending in docket No. 34694. fn1[The appeal in docket No. 34694 remains pending in this court.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML Nos. 34694, 35576. 00-04239
04/04/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing Regarding Order Denying Petition for Writ of Certiorari and Motion to Consolidate (nos. 34694/35576). 00-05438
04/11/2000Other Other. Returned, unfiled, Answer to Petition for Rehearing Regarding Order Denying Petition for Writ or Certiorari and Motion to Consolidate/Respondent's Request for Sanctions (nos. 34694/35576- -w/letter).
04/13/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Motion to Strike Answer to Petition for Rehearing regarding Order Denying Petition for Writ of Certiorari and Motion to Consolidate and Opposition to Respondent's Request for Sanctions. w/letter Nos. 34694, 35576
03/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Vacating and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-04003
04/02/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-04105
04/02/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 6, 2001. 01-04105