judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORMAN HOWARD WENGER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-90)
Case Number:06-90Case Docketed On:04/26/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:NORMAN HOWARD WENGER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:NORMAN HOWARD WENGER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNorman Howard WengerKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
Sylvia Lee Hackl
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 121
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/26/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/26/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/12/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/27/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/28/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/11/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
10/10/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
11/22/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/30/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/29/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/02/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/21/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/02/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/06/2007Order - Granting motion to withdraw. Dee Morgan allowed to withdraw as counsel.OrderOtherFinal
03/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/13/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/15/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; volume II, confidential file; volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/01/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/06/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion sent to warden signed for 8/2/07.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/17/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/17/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/21/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal