Case: A-7073
A-7073
10/24/1958
Application for Writ of Error
MYRTLE MAE CHANDLER, ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF W. J. CUNNINGHAM, DECEASED
HENDRICK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/27/1959 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
03/11/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/15/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/01/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/27/1959 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
04/27/1959 | Motion to amend application for writ of error | | ||
03/13/1959 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/11/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/15/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/01/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
12/01/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/24/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hendrick Memorial Hospital, Inc. | Respondent | |
Myrtle Mae Chandler, Administratrix of the Estate of W. J. Cunningham, deceased | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information