Case: A-7038
A-7038
10/14/1958
Application for Writ of Error
RADCLIFF FINANCE CORPORATION
J. CARUTHERS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/15/1958 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
12/10/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/07/1958 | Supplement to Petition filed | Petitioner | | |
10/14/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/29/1959 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/15/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
12/10/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/19/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/07/1958 | Supplement to Petition filed | | ||
10/14/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
10/14/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
J. Caruthers | Respondent | |
Radcliff Finance Corporation | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information