Case: A-7037
A-7037
10/14/1958
Application for Writ of Error
KEYSTONE FLEMING TRANSPORT, INC.
CITY OF TAHOKA
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/03/1958 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
11/18/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
11/03/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/14/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/03/1958 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | | ||
11/28/1958 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/18/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/03/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/14/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
10/14/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Keystone Fleming Transport, Inc. | Petitioner | |
City of Tahoka | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information