judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FEDERAL LAND BANK OF HOUSTON, MYRTLE MCDOUGALL AND WALTER MCDOUGALL v. EUGENE PHILLIP MCDOUGALL AND W. O. FREEMAN

Case: A-7048
A-7048
10/27/1958
Application for Writ of Error
FEDERAL LAND BANK OF HOUSTON, MYRTLE MCDOUGALL AND WALTER MCDOUGALL
EUGENE PHILLIP MCDOUGALL AND W. O. FREEMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/04/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/15/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
11/12/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
11/05/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
10/31/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
10/27/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/04/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/15/1958Response to Petition
11/12/1958Response to Petition
11/05/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/31/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/27/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/27/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eugene Phillip McDougall and W. O. FreemanRespondent
Myrtle McDougall and Walter McDougallPetitioner
Federal Land Bank of HoustonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information