Case: A-7024
A-7024
09/20/1958
Application for Writ of Error
M. G. AVEN
MRS. MARY F. GREEN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
09/30/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/26/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/28/1959 | Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed. | | ||
10/22/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/22/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
09/30/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
09/26/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
09/20/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
M. G. Aven | Petitioner | |
Mrs. Mary F. Green, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information