judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HENDRICKS (BRIAN) VS. STATE C/W 34256, 34420, 34541, 34927

Case Information: 34692
Short Caption:HENDRICKS (BRIAN) VS. STATE C/W 34256, 34420, 34541, 34927Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 34176 *, 34256 , 34420 , 34541 , 34692, 34927
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C159037Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07738
08/25/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 15, 1999. Court Reporter: James A. Helloso. 99-07959
09/10/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to file 22 Page Fast Track Statement. 99-08539
09/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On September 10, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion for leave to file a 22 page fast track statement. The motion is granted. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement provisionally submitted on September 10, 1999. 99-08663
09/14/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08540
09/14/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-08541
10/05/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for leave to file 12 page Fast Track Response. 99-09533
10/06/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Document: The twelve-page fast track response provisionally submitted on October 5, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-09565
10/06/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-09534
12/20/1999MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 35033, 33681, 34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927. (Docketed as document no. 99-12869 in case no. 35033.)
12/28/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Service for Motion to Consolidate (nos. 35033, 34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927). 99-13299
01/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. Order Granting Motion to Consolidate in Part. The following matters shall be consolidated for disposition only: Nos. 34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927 and 35033. Appellant's motion is denied with respect to No. 33681. Gaines has been fully briefed and is currently schedule for oral argument on January 11, 2000. We decline to consolidate Gaines with these other matters at this time. Nos. 33681,34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927 and 35033. 00-00165
04/04/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We previously granted a motion to consolidate these cases for disposition. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927, 35033. Document No. 00-05369.
04/21/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927. Doc. No. 00-06398
04/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Rehearing petition due: May 10, 2000. Nos. 34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927. Document no. 00-06704
05/08/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Petition to Enlarge the Time Period to File a Petition for Rehearing Alternatively Petition for a Rehearing Alternatively Petition to Stay the Remittitur. Nos. 34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927. Document no. 00-07524
06/13/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny the petition to extend the time for filing a petition for rehearing and the alternative petition for rehearing. We are not inclined to stay issuance of the remittitur until final disposition of certioari proceedings in Gaines. fn1[The appellant in Gaines has not filed a petition for writ of certiorari with the clerk of the United States Supreme Court.] Nonetheless, we hereby stay issuance of the remittitur to and including June 30, 2000 to allow appellants time to apply to the United States Supreme Court for a writ of certiorari. If the clerk of this court receives notice from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court by June 30, 2000, that appellants have filed a petition for writ of certiorari, this stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceeding. Otherwise, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur on July 3, 2000. Nos. 34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927. Document No. 00-10030.
06/28/2000Other Other. Filed Petition to Reconsider or Petition for a Rehearing of Appellant's Petition to Enlarge the Time Period to File a Petition for Rehearing Alternatively Petition for a Rehearing Alternatively Petition to Stay the Remittitur. Nos. 34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927. Doc. No. 00-11061
08/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny appellants' petition to reconsider or for a rehearing of their prior petition. Nonetheless, we hereby stay issuance of the remittitur to and including September 22, 2000 to allow appellants time to apply to the United States Supreme Court for a writ of certiorari. If the clerk of this court receives notice from the clerk of the US Supreme Court by September 22, 2000, that appellants have filed a petition for writ of certiorari, this stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceeding. Otherwise, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur on September 25, 2000. Nos. 34176, 34256, 34420, 34541, 34692, 34927. Doc. No. 00-14259.
10/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-18124
10/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-18124