judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNETH POTTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-60)
Case Number:06-60Case Docketed On:03/17/2006
Linked To: 06-59
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KENNETH POTTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KENNETH POTTER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKenneth PotterKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Cathleen D. Parker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 83
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/03/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/04/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/20/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/02/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/03/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
09/05/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
10/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/17/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/01/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/04/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/12/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; volume II, transcripts; volume III, confidential folder; volume IV, audio tape recording.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
02/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ryan R. Roden, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Parker) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/04/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal