judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADRIAN A. VINSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0734
Short Caption:ADRIAN A. VINSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-6192-10Filed Date:06/09/2010

Opening Event Date:06/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/15/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAdrian A. Vinson Y
Henry A. EscotoNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (12 pgs/Tape) 5/24/10 proc. (w/CD attached)
06/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
07/01/2010ORDERED: That Henry Escoto, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to June 10, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order file a dispositive motion. (By: JAC)
07/07/2010RECORD INDEX
07/07/2010RECORD COPIES
07/20/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for extension of time to file a dispositive motion
07/28/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for extension of time until July 30, 2010 to file a dispositive motion (no oppo)
07/30/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL
08/02/2010TMC - appellant's motionS to extend time to file disposition - motion for summary reversal - motion for summary affirmance - oppo
08/06/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 8/25/10. no oppo
08/25/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
08/30/2010APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for summary affirmance (Titled: aplt's reply motion for summary reversal)
09/23/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTIONS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME to file dispositive motion are granted. It is ****MORE*****
09/23/2010ORD GRANT APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF It is *****MORE*****
09/23/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. It is *****MORE******
09/23/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED. It is ****MORE*****
09/23/2010 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal is HEREBY AFFIRMED. (FITHNW) (jl)
10/15/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived