Case: PD-1684-01
PD-1684-01
08/28/2001
PDR Case Type
JACKSON, WILLARD LEE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/26/2001 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
11/07/2001 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
11/07/2001 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
10/02/2001 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
08/28/2001 | PDR FILED | | |
08/28/2001 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/29/2001 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Barry L Macha |
Jackson, Willard Lee | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | John F. Curry |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-00-00223-CR
AFF 6-21-01
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
89th District Court
Wichita
Honorable JUANITA L. PAVLICK
36,609-C