Case: A-7052
A-7052
11/06/1958
Application for Writ of Error
ROCHELLE ARONOFF AND NATHAN ARONOFF, DAVIS-MCPHAIL ELECTRIC COMPANY, FEDERAL SIGN COMPANY
CITY OF DALLAS AND TEXAS TURNPIKE AUTHORITY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/04/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/04/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/02/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/06/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
11/06/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
11/06/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/1959 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/05/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/04/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/04/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/02/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/06/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
11/06/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
11/06/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
11/06/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City of Dallas and Texas Turnpike Authority | Respondent | |
Federal Sign Company | Petitioner | |
Rochelle Aronoff and Nathan Aronoff | Petitioner | |
Davis-McPhail Electric Company | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information