Case: B-4379
B-4379
12/28/1973
Application for Writ of Error
SIRA J. EUBANK, ET AL.
CITY OF HOUSTON, BORING AND TUNNELING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., CITY OF HOUSTON, E. B CAPE AND BORING AND TUNNELING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/15/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/31/1974 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
01/28/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/22/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/28/1973 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/15/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/31/1974 | Reply to Response | | ||
01/28/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/22/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/09/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/07/1974 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Filing granted | | |
12/28/1973 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
12/28/1973 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sira J. Eubank, et al. | Petitioner | |
Boring and Tunneling Company of America, Inc. | Respondent | |
City of Houston, E. B Cape and Boring and Tunneling Company of America, Inc. | Respondent | |
City of Houston | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information