Case: B-4982
B-4982
01/09/1974
Application for Writ of Error
MISSOURI PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
J. D. CUNNINGHAM
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/13/1975 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/27/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/28/1975 | Letter Filed | | ||
04/09/1975 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/09/1975 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/09/1975 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/09/1975 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/14/1975 | Motion to dismiss | | ||
01/13/1975 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/27/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
01/09/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Missouri Pacific Railroad Company | Petitioner | |
J. D. Cunningham | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information