Case: B-4413
B-4413
01/14/1974
Application for Writ of Error
BETTY BRELAND, CARRIE BRELAND AND LINDA BRELAND
EDGAR RICE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/03/1974 | Amended Response to Petition for Review filed | Respondent | | |
01/14/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/11/1974 | Motion to dismiss | Dismissed | | |
07/03/1974 | Supplement to Motion filed | Dismissed | | |
07/03/1974 | Amended Response to Petition for Review filed | | ||
04/15/1974 | Supplement to Motion filed | Overruled | | |
01/22/1974 | Motion to dismiss | Filing granted | | |
01/14/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
01/14/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Betty Breland, Carrie Breland and Linda Breland | Petitioner | |
Edgar Rice | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information