judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MARY ROSE TURNER v. SCOBEY MOVING AND STORAGE CO.

Case: B-4419
B-4419
01/16/1974
Application for Writ of Error
MARY ROSE TURNER
SCOBEY MOVING AND STORAGE CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/22/1974Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/28/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
01/16/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/24/1974Opinion issued
07/22/1974Supplemental Brief filed
06/12/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/12/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/12/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/12/1974Document received (See Remarks)
01/28/1974Response to Petition
01/16/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/16/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Scobey Moving and Storage Co.Respondent
Mary Rose TurnerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information