Case: B-4414
B-4414
01/16/1974
Application for Writ of Error
ZUIDER ZEE OYSTER BAR, INC.
BILL G. MARTIN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/11/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/15/1974 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
02/06/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/16/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/15/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/11/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/15/1974 | Reply to Response | | ||
02/06/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/17/1974 | Motion to Amend Filed | Overruled | | |
01/16/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
01/16/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bill G. Martin | Respondent | |
Zuider Zee Oyster Bar, Inc. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information