Case: B-4933
B-4933
01/13/1974
Application for Writ of Error
CLAUDE C. COWARD, ET AL.
GATEWAY NATIONAL BANK OF BEAUMONT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/22/1975 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
12/02/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/13/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/22/1975 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/07/1975 | Opinion issued | | ||
02/12/1975 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/12/1975 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/02/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/13/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/13/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gateway National Bank of Beaumont | Respondent | |
Claude C. Coward, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information