Case: B-4411
B-4411
01/14/1974
Application for Writ of Error
JOSEPH B. MURPHY
OTIS HAMMONS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/27/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/28/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/14/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/27/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/15/1974 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/06/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
01/28/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/14/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/14/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Otis Hammons | Respondent | |
Joseph B. Murphy | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information