Case: 05-02-01209-CV
05-02-01209-CV
08/01/2002
Mandamus
In Re: First Texas Homes, Inc. and Randall Van Wolfswinkel
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
11/14/2003 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/23/2002 | Petition for Writ Mandamus | | |||
09/04/2002 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
09/04/2002 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
09/04/2002 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
09/04/2002 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
08/26/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
08/26/2002 | Response due | | |||
08/12/2002 | Response due | | |||
08/09/2002 | Motion for Extension to File Response - Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/07/2002 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
08/07/2002 | Motion for Extension to File Response Filed | | |||
08/02/2002 | Order Entered | | |||
08/01/2002 | Petition for Writ Mandamus | | |||
08/01/2002 | 75.00 Fee Paid | | |||
08/01/2002 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/04/2016 | Case Stored | Clerk record or reporter record returned to district/county clerk; case destroyed |
09/02/2008 | Status | Destroy record |
09/04/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hon. Catharina Haynes | Respondent | Dallas District Judge, 191st District Court |
April Greene And Cornell Green | Real Party in Interest | Thomas Daniel Bowers |
First Texas Homes, Inc. | Relator | Brett Dosher Lamb Mr. John D. Sloan, Jr. Sloan Melanie Irene Kemp |
Trial Court Information
191st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Catharina J.h.d. Haynes
00-9636-J