Case: 05-00-01754-CR
05-00-01754-CR
10/30/2000
Sexual Assault
White, Jimmy Lynn
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/10/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/08/2001 | Record Retention | Retain | |
10/08/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/08/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/24/2001 | Submitted | | |
09/24/2001 | Submission | | |
09/24/2001 | Submitted | | |
08/01/2001 | Submission | | |
07/25/2001 | Brief Due | | |
07/23/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/23/2001 | Brief Filed | | |
07/23/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/06/2001 | Brief Due | | |
06/25/2001 | Brief Filed | | |
06/15/2001 | Supplemental Record Due | | |
06/08/2001 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |
06/06/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
05/29/2001 | Order Entered | | |
05/18/2001 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |
05/16/2001 | Case reinstated | | |
05/16/2001 | Order Entered | | |
05/16/2001 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | |
05/16/2001 | Case reinstated | | |
05/09/2001 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |
04/16/2001 | Order Entered | Abated | |
04/16/2001 | Order Entered | Abated | |
02/20/2001 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |
02/08/2001 | Record due | | |
12/08/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
10/30/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
10/30/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/30/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/25/2000 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
10/23/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/06/2000 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/10/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jimmy Lynn White | Criminal - Appellant | Deborah Farris |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Ms. Stacey Ann Oneal William T. (Bill) Hill, Jr. |
Mary Belton | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Mary Belton |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Janice L. Warder
F95-02484-TH
10 Years