Case: 09-84-00320-CV
09-84-00320-CV
06/22/1984
Contract
Wickersham Ford, Inc.
County of Orange
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/15/1989 | Letter | | |
05/07/1987 | Letter | | |
02/18/1986 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/02/1986 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
12/26/1985 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
12/12/1985 | Opinion issued | No Description Available. | |
10/31/1985 | Submitted | | |
09/13/1985 | No Description Available. | | |
09/09/1985 | Submission | | |
12/03/1984 | Brief Filed | | |
10/03/1984 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/12/1984 | Brief Filed | | |
08/14/1984 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
07/23/1984 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/22/1984 | Transcript Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/15/1989 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
163rd District Court
Orange
Honorable John C Martin
B-26,701