judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. J. HAMMER v. DALLAS TRANSIT COMPANY

Case: A-10850
A-10850
06/11/1965
Application for Writ of Error
W. J. HAMMER
DALLAS TRANSIT COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/15/1966Supplement to Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/30/1966Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/19/1966Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/13/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/24/1965Response to PetitionRespondent
06/17/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/11/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/15/1966Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
04/08/1966Response to Motion filed
03/30/1966Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/16/1966New majority opinion substituted for prior opinion
01/19/1966Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/05/1966Letter Filed
12/13/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/24/1965Response to Petition
06/17/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/11/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/11/1965Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dallas Transit CompanyRespondent
W. James KronzerAmicus Curiae
W. J. HammerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information