judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

RAILWAY MAIL MUTUAL BENEFIT ASSOCIATION v. ELIZABETH HENRY

Case: A-155
A-155
04/26/1944
Application for Writ of Error
RAILWAY MAIL MUTUAL BENEFIT ASSOCIATION
ELIZABETH HENRY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/23/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/04/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/26/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/23/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/29/1944Bond
05/24/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/04/1944Response to Petition
04/26/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/26/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railway Mail Mutual Benefit AssociationPetitioner
Elizabeth HenryRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information