judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NATIONWIDE MUTUAL VS. COATNEY

Case Information: 36208
Short Caption:NATIONWIDE MUTUAL VS. COATNEYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A400798Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/07/2000 / Ashleman, I.R.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/08/2001 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/08/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/01/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hardy & Hardy--check no. 6635.
06/01/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09280
06/07/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: I.R. Ashleman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/28/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-15106
08/28/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
09/11/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-15925
09/15/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-16294
09/22/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-16800
11/09/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/22/00. Court Reporter: Kris Cornelius. 00-19702
12/06/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: February 22, 2000. Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. 00-21306
12/13/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-21758
12/26/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 12/21/00. 00-22422
12/26/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-22423
01/25/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
02/05/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/02/01. 01-02312
02/05/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-02313
03/02/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 03/01/01. 01-03841
08/23/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 8, 2001, at 11:00 a.m. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
09/24/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/08/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
03/11/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Patrick K. McKnight. 02-04408
03/15/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Shearing, Rose and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. NNP02 02-04702
04/04/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from McKnight & Asso. Ltd.--check no. 7274.
04/04/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Respondents Coatneys' Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: 4/2/02. 02-05999
05/10/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40( c). NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-08196
05/22/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Mailed on: 5/20/02. 02-09040
05/28/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08267
05/28/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/17/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 3, 2002. 02-08267
07/25/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin.
07/26/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[The Honorable A. William Maupin, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC 02-12860