judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF SUBLETTE v. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

Case Heading (06-42)
Case Number:06-42Case Docketed On:03/02/2006
Linked To: 06-41
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF SUBLETTE v. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Full Title:BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF SUBLETTE, Appellant (Defendant), v. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThe Board of County Commissioners of Sublette County, WyomingJohn C. McKinley
AppelleeExxon Mobil CorporationLawrence J. Wolfe
Patrick Reed Day
Walter F. Eggers III
Brent R. Kunz

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 112
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/02/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/02/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/02/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/02/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/03/2006Brief - Appellant Sublette County.BriefAppellantFinal
05/04/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/19/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/05/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eight volumes. Volumes I-VI, original papers; volume VII, transcripts; volume VIII, sealed document.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/24/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from Martin Hardsocg regarding scheduling conflict with oral argument in October 2006.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assignment of judge. Justice Kite recused and Judge David B. Park assigned.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/30/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/31/2006Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
01/19/2007Order - Assignment of judge. Justice Hill recused and Judge Scott W. Skavdahl assigned.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden and Burke and District Judges Park and Skavdahl; (Martin L. Hardsocg and John C. McKinley for the appellant; Patrick R. Day and Walter F. Eggers, argument by Mr. Day) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/02/2007Petition - Rehearing and brief in support of petitionPetitionRehearingFinal
08/22/2007Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/22/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/27/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 08/24/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal