judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARRYL L. BEASLEY V. ROWE CONTRACTING SERVICES INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-0724
Short Caption:DARRYL L. BEASLEY V. ROWE CONTRACTING SERVICES INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7561-09Filed Date:06/07/2010

Opening Event Date:06/07/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/22/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/07/2010
Argued/Submitted:03/16/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/18/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarryl L. Beasley NPro SeN
AppelleeRowe Contracting Services Inc.N
Amy Kingston Walborn NN
Kenneth WecksteinYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 7, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
07/22/2010RECORD INDEX
07/22/2010RECORD COMPLETED
07/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
07/28/2010APPEARANCE - of Kenneth B. Weckstein as counsel for aple
07/28/2010APPEARANCE - of Amy Kingston Walborn counsel for aple
09/03/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/03/2010APPENDIX
10/07/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
10/07/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/09/2010FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
11/09/2010 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of January 2011 through March 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by NOV. 22, 2010, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
11/17/2010LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
02/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
03/16/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/16/2011FiledARGUED before Judges Washington, Glickman, King Darryl L. Beasley, Pro Se for appellant Kenneth Weckstein, Esq. for appellee
03/25/2011REVERSED AND REMANDED (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and King, Senior Judge.)
04/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED