Case: A-10854
A-10854
06/15/1965
Application for Writ of Error
F. W. WOOLWORTH COMPANY
THOMAS GARZA, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXRT FRIEND OF MARIA A. GARZA, A MINOR
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/20/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/15/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/27/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/20/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/01/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/28/1965 | Motion to dismiss | | ||
06/15/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/15/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Thomas Garza, individually and as Nexrt Friend of Maria A. Garza, a minor | Respondent | |
F. W. Woolworth Company | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information