judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JOSEPH J. BUKOVICH v. SALLY A. BUKOVICH

Case: A-10881
A-10881
06/29/1965
Application for Writ of Error
JOSEPH J. BUKOVICH
SALLY A. BUKOVICH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
01/24/1966Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/01/1965Response to PetitionRespondent
06/29/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
02/23/1966Concurring Opinion issued.
01/24/1966Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/12/1966Opinion issued
11/01/1965Response to Petition
11/01/1965Miscellaneous Motion
10/06/1965Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1965Document received (See Remarks)
06/29/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/29/1965Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sally A. BukovichRespondent
Joseph J. BukovichPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information