Case: A-10836
A-10836
06/07/1965
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF HOUSTON
JOHN MOORE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/23/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/22/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/07/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/04/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
08/06/1965 | Motion to dismiss | Overruled | | |
07/23/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/22/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/07/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/07/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
John Moore | Respondent | |
City of Houston | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information