Case: 04-00-00527-CR
04-00-00527-CR
08/14/2000
Murder
Elsie Castillo Moreno
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/02/2001 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
11/02/2001 | Mandate received by the trial court | | |
11/01/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/01/2001 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
10/19/2001 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | |
10/03/2001 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | |
08/21/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
08/15/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
08/10/2001 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
07/12/2001 | Petition for Review Filed | | |
06/13/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/24/2001 | Submitted | | |
04/12/2001 | Motion for Reconsideration Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/21/2001 | Motion for Reconsideration Filed | | |
03/13/2001 | Submission | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/22/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/19/2001 | Brief Filed | | |
12/21/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/20/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
11/21/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/20/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
10/20/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
09/20/2000 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
08/21/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
08/21/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/14/2000 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
08/14/2000 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
08/14/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/03/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
06/22/2000 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
05/25/2000 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/01/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Ilse D. Bailey |
Moreno, Elsie Castillo | Criminal - Appellant | Emmett Harris |
Trial Court Information
38th Judicial District Court
Uvalde
Honorable Rey Perez
2000-01-9868-CR
99 YEARS TDCJ-ID