Case: A-10852
A-10852
06/07/1965
Application for Writ of Error
GILES MILLER
MARTHA CARLSON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
07/07/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/11/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/02/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/20/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/07/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/01/1965 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | | ||
06/11/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/11/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/07/1965 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Giles Miller | Petitioner | |
Martha Carlson | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information