Case: A-10865
A-10865
06/18/1965
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
HERMAN BEARD, SR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/06/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
07/29/1965 | Supplement to Petition filed | Petitioner | | |
07/21/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/18/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/18/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
08/06/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/29/1965 | Supplement to Petition filed | | ||
07/21/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/18/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Refused | | |
06/18/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Herman Beard, Sr. | Respondent | |
Texas Employers Insurance Association | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information