judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Texas Board of Chiropractic Examiners v. Chiropractic Society of Texas; Texas Physical Therapy Association, Inc.; Texas Occupational Therapy Association, Inc.; Certified Orthotics and Prosthetics Advocates, Inc.; Jerry D. Julian, M.D.; and Thomas I. Lowry, M.D.

Case: 03-95-00208-CV
03-95-00208-CV
04/07/1995
Administrative law
Texas Board of Chiropractic Examiners
Chiropractic Society of Texas; Texas Physical Therapy Association, Inc.; Texas Occupational Therapy Association, Inc.; Certified Orthotics and Prosthetics Advocates, Inc.; Jerry D. Julian, M.D.; and Thomas I. Lowry, M.D.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
04/23/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/01/1997CASE STORED
11/01/1995Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
10/24/1995Letter requesting pickup of exhibits
10/24/1995Mandate Issued
08/16/1995Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/26/1995Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/26/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/23/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/28/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/27/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/14/1995Letter received
04/12/1995Exhibits filed
04/12/1995Statement of Facts Filed
04/07/1995Attachments to transcript
04/07/1995Transcript Filed
04/07/1995Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chiropractic Society Of TexasAppelleeMs. Mary Schaerdel Canfield
Julian, M.D., Jerry D.AppelleeMs. Mary Schaerdel Canfield
Certified Orthotics And ProsthAppelleeMs. Mary Schaerdel Canfield
Texas Board Of Chiropractic ExAppellantThe Honorable Dan Morales
Mr. Dewey E. Helmcamp III
Lowry, M.D., Thomas I.AppelleeMs. Mary Schaerdel Canfield
Texas Occupational Therapy AssAppelleeMs. Mary Schaerdel Canfield
Texas Physical Therapy AssociaAppelleeMs. Mary Schaerdel Canfield
Trial Court Information
200th District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
94-08315