Case: 03-98-00040-CR
03-98-00040-CR
01/16/1998
Murder
Diana Dial
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/2013 | Letter received |
| |||||
06/14/2013 | Letter received | | |||||
05/01/2012 | Letter received | | |||||
02/09/2012 | Letter received | | |||||
12/12/2011 | Letter received | | |||||
12/06/2011 | Letter received | | |||||
11/28/2011 | Letter received | | |||||
09/27/2011 | Letter received | | |||||
06/01/2011 | Notice received | | |||||
04/15/2011 | Letter received | | |||||
02/15/2011 | Letter received | | |||||
02/08/2011 | Letter received | | |||||
01/25/2011 | Letter received | | |||||
12/28/2010 | Notice received | | |||||
12/03/2010 | Notice received | | |||||
03/24/2008 | Letter received | | |||||
12/20/2001 | Case stored | | |||||
12/06/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
12/03/1999 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||
11/10/1999 | Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court | Refused | | ||||
07/28/1999 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
07/19/1999 | Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court | | |||||
06/17/1999 | Motion for rehearing en banc | Overruled | | ||||
06/02/1999 | Motion for rehearing en banc | | |||||
06/02/1999 | Motion for extension to file motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/01/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Received | | |||||
05/21/1999 | Motion for extension time to file motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
05/06/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
01/28/1999 | Submitted | | |||||
01/28/1999 | Submission | | |||||
01/20/1999 | Oral argument waiver received | | |||||
01/15/1999 | Response received | | |||||
01/15/1999 | Motion to postpone oral argument | Overruled | | ||||
01/13/1999 | Motion to postpone oral argument | | |||||
01/11/1999 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |||||
01/07/1999 | Submission | | |||||
01/05/1999 | Brief filed | | |||||
10/29/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
09/15/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
09/09/1998 | Motion for leave to file brief in excess of 50 pgs | Overruled | | ||||
09/01/1998 | Mt to file Brief in Excess of 50 pages filed | | |||||
08/21/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/17/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
07/02/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/29/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
06/02/1998 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
06/02/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
05/04/1998 | Notice received | | |||||
04/17/1998 | Notice of no Court Reporter's Record Recd or Filed | | |||||
04/15/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
03/05/1998 | Docketing statement received | | |||||
02/05/1998 | Docketing statement to appellant's counsel | | |||||
01/16/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
01/16/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/06/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State Prosecuting Attorney | Interested party | The Honorable Matthew W. Paul |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Ken Anderson |
Administrative Judicial Judge | Regional Administrative Judge | The Honorable B. B. Schraub |
Dial, Diana | Appellant | Mr. Alexander L. Calhoun |
Trial Court Information
277th District Court
Williamson
Honorable Johnny William Carter
97-569-K277
60 yrs.