Case: 05-01-01322-CV
05-01-01322-CV
08/17/2001
Miscellaneous civil
Carlos Slim Helu, Grupo Sanborns S.A. de C.V., and Grupo Carso S.A. De C.V.
COC Services, Ltd.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/29/2018 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
10/21/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
10/22/2001 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |||
09/18/2001 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
09/18/2001 | Order Entered | Vacated | | ||
09/18/2001 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
09/18/2001 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
09/17/2001 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/15/2001 | Record due | | |||
09/14/2001 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |||
09/10/2001 | Notice Filed | | |||
08/28/2001 | ADR Referral Order Issued | | |||
08/27/2001 | Letter Filed | | |||
08/17/2001 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
08/17/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
08/17/2001 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |||
08/17/2001 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
08/17/2001 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
08/17/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
08/16/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
08/16/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
08/16/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
05/18/2001 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/29/2018 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
John Estes | Mediator | John Estes |
Coc Services, Ltd. | Appellee | P. Michael Jung |
Grupo Carso, Grupo Sanborns & | Appellant | Mark T. Josephs |
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Edwin V King
00-8358-F