Case: 05-95-00472-CV
05-95-00472-CV
04/07/1995
Contract
Short, Bob & Associates, Inc.
Heritage Resources, Inc., Michael B. Wisenbaker, and Dale F. Dorn
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/04/2016 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
10/06/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/17/1997 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
05/28/1997 | Letter Filed | | |||
05/05/1997 | Case stored | | |||
05/05/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |||
05/05/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |||
03/07/1997 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |||
11/26/1996 | Writ of Error Denied | | |||
08/13/1996 | File Received by Court of Criminal Appeals | | |||
08/07/1996 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
07/11/1996 | Application for Writ of Error Filed | | |||
06/07/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
05/28/1996 | Response to Motion | | |||
05/20/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
04/30/1996 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||
04/30/1996 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||
02/28/1996 | Submission | | |||
02/28/1996 | Submitted | | |||
02/28/1996 | Submission | | |||
02/28/1996 | Submitted | | |||
02/26/1996 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||
02/12/1996 | Request for Oral Argument | | |||
02/06/1996 | MattConv | | |||
08/24/1995 | Brief Filed | | |||
08/24/1995 | MattConv | | |||
08/17/1995 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/15/1995 | Response to Motion | | |||
08/04/1995 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
08/01/1995 | Brief Filed | | |||
08/01/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |||
08/01/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |||
07/30/1995 | MattConv | | |||
07/05/1995 | Brief Filed | | |||
07/03/1995 | MattConv | | |||
06/12/1995 | MattConv | | |||
06/06/1995 | Record due | | |||
06/05/1995 | Transcript Filed | | |||
05/27/1995 | Settle/Not Settle - ADR Report Due | | |||
05/23/1995 | Objection Disposed | | |||
05/12/1995 | Response to Motion | | |||
05/07/1995 | Record due | | |||
05/04/1995 | Motion to Set Aside | | |||
05/04/1995 | Objection Filed | | |||
04/27/1995 | ADR Referral Order Issued | Referred to Mediation | | ||
04/07/1995 | Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellant | | |||
04/07/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
04/06/1995 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |||
03/08/1995 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/04/2016 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Heritage Resources, Inc., Mich | Appellee | Edward Wayne Malouf |
Short, Bob & Associates, Inc. | Appellant | James A. Fisher |
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable David Cave
94-6420