Case: 95-0338
95-0338
04/07/1995
Extension to file App Writ Err Under Rule 130d
KENNETH R. WALTS
DR. LUTHER ROSS SUPERINTENDENT KERRVILLE STATE HOSPITAL TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MENTAL HEALTH AND MENTAL RETARDATION d/b/a THE UVALDE COUNTY COMMUNITY SERVICE CENTER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/08/1995 | Motion for Rehearing | Motion for extension of time to file App Writ Err. | Rule 4(b) envelope attached | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/19/1995 | Case Stored | Mo/Re Overruled | | |
05/19/1995 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to COA will be storing case | | |
05/18/1995 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | | |
05/08/1995 | Motion for Rehearing | Rule 4(b) envelope attached | | |
05/08/1995 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | of 130(d) record remains in clerk's office | | |
04/20/1995 | Extension of time to file app writ err disposed of | Overruled | w/the following notation: "Considered as a petition for review under Rule 100( g), T.R.A.P.; see Nolan v. Ramsey, 783 S.W. 2d 212 (Tex. 1990)" | |
04/07/1995 | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | | | |
04/07/1995 | Extension of time to file app writ err filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/19/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Mo/Re Overruled |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MHMR | Respondent | Ms. Kathlyn C. Wilson |
UVALDE COUNTY COMMUNITY SVS CR | Respondent | Ms. Kathlyn C. Wilson |
ROSS, LUTHER | Respondent | Ms. Kathlyn C. Wilson |
KERRVILLE STATE HOSPITAL | Respondent | Ms. Kathlyn C. Wilson |
WALTS, KENNETH R. | Petitioner | Mr. Ken Walts |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-93-00559-CV
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
38th District Court
Uvalde
92-06-18,066-CV