Case: A-10878
A-10878
06/28/1965
Application for Writ of Error
SUPERIOR OIL COMPANY
NEWMAN ROBERTS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/14/1965 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
09/24/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/02/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
08/18/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/28/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/05/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/14/1965 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
10/06/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
09/24/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
09/02/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
08/18/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
06/28/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
06/28/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SUPERIOR OIL COMPANY | Petitioner | |
Raymond M. Myers | Amicus Curiae | |
James A. Kilgore and Kiel Boone | Amicus Curiae | |
Newman Roberts, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information