Case: A-10889
A-10889
06/29/1965
Application for Writ of Error
CLAUDINE AVANT, DWIGHT W. AVANT AND QUEENTENA AVANT
AETNA CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/18/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
07/16/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/13/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/06/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
06/29/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/18/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/16/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/13/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/06/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/29/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/29/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Claudine Avant | Petitioner | |
Aetna Casualty and Surety Company | Respondent | |
Dwight W. Avant and Queentena Avant | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information