judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KESTERSON (JACKIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36207
Short Caption:KESTERSON (JACKIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR992306Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/01/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/01/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-09277
06/05/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 03/21/00 and 04/27/00. Court Reporter: J. Schonlau and J. Dotson. Filed in district court on: May 30, 2000. 00-09388
06/12/2000MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion for Temporary Suspension of NRAP 3C. 00-09873
06/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 00-10047
06/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court. Counsel for appellant shall, within 30 days of this order, either provide a copy of the district court's order unsealing the proceedings, or file a motion to withdraw this appeal. 00-11166
08/02/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. 00-13336
08/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant moves to withdraw as counsel in this appeal. Counsel may not withdraw until he or she has fulfilled the obligations set forth in NRAP 3C(b). Court reporters Schonlau and Dotson shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, prepare the requested transcripts and file them in the district court under seal. The court reporters shall also provide copies of the transcripts to this court and the parties under seal. Counsel for appellant shall, within 40 days of this order, file the fast track statement and appendix. fn1[Counsel may file a motion to file the fast track statement and response in this court under seal.] 00-14293
08/22/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 04/27/99. Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 00-14750
08/23/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 21, 2000. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. (SEALED) 00-14795
09/27/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-17047
09/27/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-17049
10/02/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-17350
11/06/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they are without merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-19442
12/04/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19642
12/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/08/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2000. 00-19642