judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE v. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

Case Heading (06-41)
Case Number:06-41Case Docketed On:03/02/2006
Linked To: 06-42
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE v. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Full Title:WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, Appellant (Defendant), v. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of RevenuePatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Martin L. Hardsocg
William Francis Russell
AppelleeExxon Mobil CorporationLawrence J. Wolfe
Patrick Reed Day
Walter F. Eggers III
Brent R. Kunz

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 112
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/02/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/02/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/02/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/02/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/03/2006Brief - Appellant - Wyoming Department of Revenue; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
06/19/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/06/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eight volumes. Volumes I-VI, original papers; volume VII, transcripts; volume VIII, sealed document.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/24/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from Martin Hardsocg regarding scheduling conflict with oral argument in October 2006.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/27/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assignment of judge. Justice Kite recused and Judge David B. Park assigned.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/30/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/31/2006Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
01/19/2007Order - Assignment of judge. Justice Hill recused and Judge Scott W. Skavdahl assigned.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden and Burke and District Judges Park and Skavdahl; (Martin L. Hardsocg and John C. McKinley for the appellant; Patrick R. Day and Walter F. Eggers, argument by Mr. Day) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/02/2007Petition - Rehearing and brief in support of petitionPetitionRehearingFinal
08/22/2007Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/22/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/27/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 08/24/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal