judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MATTHEWS, JOHN D. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-1242
Short Caption:MATTHEWS, JOHN D. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:09/15/1981

Opening Event Date:09/15/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/09/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/29/1982
Argued/Submitted:10/06/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Raymond M. Hertz NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MATTHEWS, JOHN D. AKA JOHN DONALD UNITED STATES
09/15/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/09/1982FiledRecord Completed
07/29/1982FiledBriefing Completed
10/06/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/09/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition