Case: A-10868
A-10868
06/21/1965
Application for Writ of Error
HOUSTON LIGHTING AND POWER COMPANY
TENN-TEX ALLOY AND CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/17/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
11/15/1965 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
11/10/1965 | Response to Reply filed | Respondent | | |
07/19/1965 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
07/05/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/21/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/22/1966 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/17/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/02/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
11/15/1965 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
11/10/1965 | Response to Reply filed | | ||
07/28/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/19/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
07/05/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/21/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
06/21/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Houston Lighting and Power Company | Petitioner | |
Tenn-Tex Alloy and Chemical Corporation | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information