Case: 10-95-00074-CR
10-95-00074-CR
04/05/1995
Other Drug Possession
James Arthur Lewis
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/04/1996 | Case stored | | |
03/04/1996 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
01/17/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/06/1995 | Submitted | | |
12/06/1995 | Submission | | |
11/13/1995 | Submission | | |
09/25/1995 | Brief filed, oral argument not requested | | |
09/25/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/05/1995 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/30/1995 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | | |
06/20/1995 | Brief filed, oral argument requested | | |
05/19/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
04/14/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
04/05/1995 | Notice of Appeal filed | | |
04/05/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/04/2021 | Case Stored | Destroy case in 25 years. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas, The State Of | Criminal - State of Texas | John C. Paschall Linda F. Stutt |
Lewis, James Arthur | Appellant | Stephen A. Gustitis |
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court
Robertson
Honorable Robert M. Stem
95-01-15,710-CR
4 yrs supervision, $500