Case: A-10863
A-10863
06/17/1965
Application for Writ of Error
RUSSELL H. SITTON, ET UX.
AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/23/1967 | Letter brief | Respondent | | |
10/18/1965 | Response to Reply filed | Petitioner | | |
10/13/1965 | Letter brief | Respondent | | |
10/12/1965 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
10/04/1965 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
09/28/1965 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
09/07/1965 | Letter brief | Respondent | | |
08/31/1965 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
07/29/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/29/1965 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
06/25/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/17/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/23/1967 | Letter brief | | ||
01/21/1967 | Miscellaneous Motion | Overruled | | |
01/16/1967 | Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed. | | ||
03/21/1966 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
03/14/1966 | Letter Filed | | ||
10/18/1965 | Response to Reply filed | | ||
10/13/1965 | Letter brief | | ||
10/12/1965 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
10/05/1965 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
10/04/1965 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | | ||
09/28/1965 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
09/07/1965 | Letter brief | | ||
08/31/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
08/04/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/29/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/29/1965 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
06/25/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/17/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/17/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Russell H. Sitton, et ux. | Petitioner | |
AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information