Case: 14-94-00272-CV
14-94-00272-CV
03/22/1994
Mandamus/prohibition
Easton, Michael
Chambers, Eugene, Judge of 215th District Court, Harris
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/31/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
03/28/1994 | Case stored | | |
03/24/1994 | Motion to Expedite Appeal DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
03/24/1994 | Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RES | DENIED | |
03/24/1994 | Opinion issued | DENIED | |
03/24/1994 | Opinion issued | DENIED | |
03/23/1994 | Submitted | | |
03/23/1994 | Submission | | |
03/23/1994 | Submitted | | |
03/22/1994 | Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES | | |
03/22/1994 | Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL | | |
03/22/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/28/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Respondent | Hon. Guy Fisher |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Respondent | Judge, 215th District Court |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Relator | Mr. Michael Easton |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Respondent | John Edward Maher |
Trial Court Information
215th District Court
Harris
Honorable EUGENE CHAMBERS
92-35041